By: Hall S.B. No. 1252 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2015; March 17, 2015, read first time and referred to Subcommittee on Border Security; April 21, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute to Committee on Veteran Affairs and Military Installations; April 27, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 3; April 27, 2015, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1252 By: Hall A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to an interstate compact on border security and immigration enforcement. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Title 7, Government Code, is amended by adding Chapter 793 to read as follows: CHAPTER 793. INTERSTATE COMPACT FOR BORDER SECURITY Sec. 793.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "illegal alien" means a person who: (1) is not a citizen or national of the United States; and (2) is unlawfully present in the United States according to the terms of 8 U.S.C. Section 1101 et seq. Sec. 793.002. AUTHORITY TO EXECUTE INTERSTATE COMPACT. On behalf of this state, the governor shall: (1) coordinate, develop, and execute an interstate compact for border security among interested states; (2) call a special session of the legislature to adopt a compact described by Subdivision (1) on or before the 31st day after another state adopts the compact; and (3) seek the approval of the United States Congress for the compact. Sec. 793.003. INTERSTATE COMPACT PROVISIONS. The compact required by this chapter must provide for joint action among compacting states on matters that include: (1) the operational control of this state's border with Mexico by the total detection and apprehension or deflection of illegal aliens attempting to cross the border into this state; and (2) otherwise enforcing federal immigration laws, including detecting, apprehending, detaining, prosecuting, releasing, and monitoring of illegal aliens. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. * * * * *