Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1252 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/27/2015

                    By: Hall S.B. No. 1252
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2015; March 17, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Subcommittee on Border Security;
 April 21, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute to Committee on Veteran Affairs and Military
 Installations; April 27, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 3;
 April 27, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1252 By:  Hall


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an interstate compact on border security and
 immigration enforcement.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 7, Government Code, is amended by adding
 Chapter 793 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 793.  INTERSTATE COMPACT FOR BORDER SECURITY
 Sec. 793.001.  DEFINITION.  In this chapter, "illegal alien"
 means a person who:
 (1)  is not a citizen or national of the United States;
 and
 (2)  is unlawfully present in the United States
 according to the terms of 8 U.S.C. Section 1101 et seq.
 Sec. 793.002.  AUTHORITY TO EXECUTE INTERSTATE COMPACT. On
 behalf of this state, the governor shall:
 (1)  coordinate, develop, and execute an interstate
 compact for border security among interested states;
 (2)  call a special session of the legislature to adopt
 a compact described by Subdivision (1) on or before the 31st day
 after another state adopts the compact; and
 (3)  seek the approval of the United States Congress
 for the compact.
 Sec. 793.003.  INTERSTATE COMPACT PROVISIONS. The compact
 required by this chapter must provide for joint action among
 compacting states on matters that include:
 (1)  the operational control of this state's border
 with Mexico by the total detection and apprehension or deflection
 of illegal aliens attempting to cross the border into this state;
 and
 (2)  otherwise enforcing federal immigration laws,
 including detecting, apprehending, detaining, prosecuting,
 releasing, and monitoring of illegal aliens.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *