Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1281 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1281
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2015; March 18, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 16, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 16, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a local government to participate in a
 cooperative purchasing program with local governments of this state
 or another state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 271.102(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A local government may participate in a cooperative
 purchasing program with another local government of this state or
 another state or with a local cooperative organization of this
 state or another state.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *