Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1304 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1304


 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a women veterans mental health
 initiative within the mental health intervention program for
 veterans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1001.202, Health and Safety Code, as
 added by Chapter 352 (H.B. 2392), Acts of the 83rd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2013, and amended by S.B. 219, Acts of the 84th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 1001.202.  GENERAL POWERS AND DUTIES. (a)  The
 department shall develop a mental health intervention program for
 veterans.  The program must include:
 (1)  peer-to-peer counseling;
 (2)  access to licensed mental health professionals for
 volunteer coordinators and peers;
 (3)  training approved by the department for peers;
 (4)  technical assistance for volunteer coordinators
 and peers;
 (5)  grants to regional and local organizations
 providing services under this subchapter;
 (6)  recruitment, retention, and screening of
 community-based therapists;
 (7)  suicide prevention training for volunteer
 coordinators and peers; and
 (8)  veteran jail diversion services, including
 veterans courts.
 (a-1)  As part of the mental health intervention program for
 veterans, the department shall develop a women veterans mental
 health initiative.
 (b)  The department shall solicit and ensure that
 specialized training is provided to persons who are peers and who
 want to provide peer-to-peer counseling or other peer-to-peer
 services under the program.
 (c)  The executive commissioner may adopt rules necessary to
 implement this subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1304 passed the Senate on
 April 29, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1304 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 137,
 Nays 3, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor