Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1309 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Menéndez S.B. No. 1309
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2015; March 18, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 23, 2015,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0;
 April 23, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility requirements for issuance of a teaching
 certificate to an applicant who holds a Junior Reserve Officer
 Training Corps instructor teaching certification.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 21.052, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.052.  CERTIFICATION OF EDUCATORS FROM OUTSIDE
 JURISDICTION [THE STATE].
 SECTION 2.  Section 21.052, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  The board may issue a certificate to an educator who
 applies for a certificate and:
 (1)  holds[:
 [(A)]  a degree issued by:
 (A)  an institution accredited by a regional
 accrediting agency or group that is recognized by a nationally
 recognized accreditation board; or
 (B)  [a degree issued by] an institution located
 in a foreign country, if the degree is equivalent to a degree
 described by Paragraph (A);
 (2)  holds:
 (A)  an appropriate certificate or other
 credential issued by another state or country; or
 (B)  a Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps
 instructor teaching certification issued by the United States
 Department of Defense, United States Army, United States Navy,
 United States Air Force, or United States Marine Corps; and
 (3)  performs satisfactorily on:
 (A)  the examination prescribed under Section
 21.048; or
 (B)  if the educator holds a certificate or other
 credential issued by another state or country, an examination
 similar to and at least as rigorous as that described by Paragraph
 (A) administered to the educator under the authority of that state.
 (a-1)  For purposes of Subsection (a)(1), the board may not
 impose on an applicant who holds a teaching certification described
 by Subsection (a)(2)(B) requirements described by Section 21.050 in
 connection with the degree requirement.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *