Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1313 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/15/2015

                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1313
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2015; March 18, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 15, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 15, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the names of certain businesses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 5.053(b), Business Organizations Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Subsection (a) does not apply if the other entity or the
 person for whom the name is reserved or registered, as appropriate,
 provides to the secretary of state a notarized written statement of
 the entity's or person's consent [consents in writing] to the use of
 the similar name.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *