Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1325 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/04/2015

                    By: Menéndez S.B. No. 1325
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2015; March 18, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and
 Military Installations; May 4, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays
 3; May 4, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1325 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to grants to local governmental entities from the Texas
 Military Preparedness Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 436.202, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), and (c) and adding Subsection (e) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  From money appropriated for this purpose, the
 commission may make a grant to an eligible local governmental
 entity to:
 (1)  enable the entity to match money or meet an
 investment requirement necessary to receive federal assistance
 provided to the local governmental entity for responding to or
 recovering from an event described by Section 436.201(b);
 (2)  match the entity's contribution for a purpose
 described by Section 436.203 at a closed or realigned defense
 facility; [or]
 (3)  construct infrastructure and other projects
 necessary to accommodate a new or expanded military mission at a
 military base or to reduce the impact of an action of the United
 States Department of Defense that will negatively impact a defense
 facility located in or near the entity; or
 (4)  construct affordable single family, multifamily,
 and veteran's supportive housing financed under the low income
 housing tax credit program under Subchapter DD, Chapter 2306.
 (b)  The commission may not make a grant for an amount less
 than $50,000 or an amount more than the lesser of:
 (1)  50 percent of the amount of matching money or
 investment that the local governmental entity is required to
 provide, subject to Subsection (c);
 (2)  50 percent of the local governmental entity's
 investment for purposes described by Section 436.203 if federal
 assistance is unavailable; or
 (3)  $5 [$2] million.
 (c)  If the local governmental entity demonstrates to the
 commission that, because of a limited budget, the entity lacks the
 resources necessary to provide 50 percent of the amount of matching
 money or investment that the entity is required to provide, the
 commission may make a grant in an amount of not more than 80 percent
 of the amount of that matching money or investment requirement but
 may not make a grant in an amount that exceeds $5 [$2] million.
 (e)  The commission may make a grant to an eligible local
 governmental entity for a project described by Subsection (a)(4) in
 an amount that does not exceed the lesser of 10 percent of the total
 construction cost of the project or $5 million.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *