Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1326 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2015

                    By: Menéndez S.B. No. 1326
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2015; March 18, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 20, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the maximum cumulative period allowed for restoration
 of a defendant's competency to stand trial and to certain time
 credits awarded against that cumulative period.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 46B.0095, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  In addition to the time credit awarded under Subsection
 (d), the court may credit to the cumulative period described by
 Subsection (a) any good conduct time the defendant may have been
 granted under Article 42.032 in relation to the defendant's
 confinement as described by Subsection (d).
 SECTION 2.  Article 46B.010, Code of Criminal Procedure, as
 amended by Chapters 718 (H.B. 748) and 822 (H.B. 2725), Acts of the
 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, is reenacted to read as
 follows:
 Art. 46B.010.  MANDATORY DISMISSAL OF MISDEMEANOR CHARGES.
 If a court orders that a defendant charged with a misdemeanor
 punishable by confinement be committed to a mental hospital or
 other inpatient or residential facility, participate in an
 outpatient treatment program, or be subjected to both inpatient and
 outpatient treatment, and the defendant is not tried before the
 expiration of the maximum period of restoration described by
 Article 46B.0095:
 (1)  on the motion of the attorney representing the
 state, the court shall dismiss the charge; or
 (2)  on the motion of the attorney representing the
 defendant and notice to the attorney representing the state, the
 court [shall]:
 (A)  shall set the matter to be heard not later
 than the 10th day after the date of filing of the motion; and
 (B)  may dismiss the charge on a finding that the
 defendant was not tried before the expiration of the maximum period
 of restoration.
 SECTION 3.  Article 46B.0095(d), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 as added by Chapter 718 (H.B. 748), Acts of the 82nd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2011, is repealed.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a defendant with respect to whom any proceeding under Chapter
 46B, Code of Criminal Procedure, is conducted on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *