S.B. No. 1338 AN ACT relating to an exemption from length limitations for certain vehicles or combinations of vehicles used to transport harvest machines. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 622.902, Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 622.902. LENGTH EXCEPTIONS. The length limitations provided by Sections 621.203 to 621.205 do not apply to: (1) machinery used exclusively for drilling water wells, including machinery that is itself a unit or that is a unit mounted on a conventional vehicle or chassis; (2) a vehicle owned or operated by a public, private, or volunteer fire department; (3) a vehicle or combination of vehicles operated exclusively in the territory of a municipality or to a combination of vehicles operated by a municipality in a suburb adjoining the municipality in which the municipality has been using the equipment or similar equipment in connection with an established service to the suburb; (4) a truck-tractor, truck-tractor combination, or truck-trailer combination exclusively transporting machinery, materials, and equipment used in the construction, operation, and maintenance of facilities, including pipelines, that are used for the discovery, production, and processing of natural gas or petroleum; (5) a drive-away saddlemount vehicle transporter combination or a drive-away saddlemount with fullmount vehicle transporter combination, as defined by 23 C.F.R. Part 658 or its successor, if: (A) the overall length of the combination is not longer than 97 feet; and (B) the combination does not have more than three saddlemounted vehicles if the combination does not include more than one fullmount vehicle; (6) the combination of a tow truck and another vehicle or vehicle combination if: (A) the other vehicle or vehicle combination cannot be normally or safely driven or was abandoned on a highway; and (B) the tow truck is towing the other vehicle or vehicle combination directly to the nearest authorized place of repair, terminal, or destination of unloading; [or] (7) a vehicle or combination of vehicles used to transport a harvest machine [combine] that is used in farm custom harvesting operations on a farm if the overall length of the vehicle or combination is not longer than: (A) 75 feet if the vehicle is traveling on a highway that is part of the national system of interstate and defense highways or the federal aid primary highway system; or (B) 81-1/2 feet if the vehicle is not traveling on a highway that is part of the national system of interstate and defense highways or the federal aid primary highway system; or (8) a truck-tractor operated in combination with a semitrailer and trailer or semitrailer and semitrailer if: (A) the combination is used to transport a harvest machine that is used in farm custom harvesting operations on a farm; (B) the overall length of the combination, excluding the length of the truck-tractor, is not longer than 81-1/2 feet; and (C) the combination is traveling on a highway that: (i) is not part of the national system of interstate and defense highways or the federal aid primary highway system; and (ii) is located in a county with a population of less than 300,000. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1338 passed the Senate on May 5, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; May 28, 2015, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 29, 2015, House granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2015, Senate adopted Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1338 passed the House, with amendment, on May 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, two present not voting; May 29, 2015, House granted request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; May 31, 2015, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, two present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor