Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1356 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1356
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2015; March 18, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 22, 2015,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 3;
 April 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to exemption from the sales tax for certain
 water-efficient products for a limited period.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 151, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 151.3335 to read as follows:
 Sec. 151.3335.  WATER-EFFICIENT PRODUCTS. (a)  In this
 section, "WaterSense product" means a product that has been
 designated as a WaterSense certified product under the WaterSense
 program operated by the United States Environmental Protection
 Agency, or a similar successor program.
 (b)  The sale of a WaterSense product is exempted from the
 taxes imposed by this chapter if the sale takes place during the
 period described by Section 151.333(c).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect July 1, 2015, if it
 receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each
 house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.
 If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for effect on that
 date, this Act takes effect October 1, 2015.
 * * * * *