Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1356 Senate Amendments Printing / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 22, 2015      TO: Honorable Dan Patrick, Lieutenant Governor, Senate      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1356 by Hinojosa (Relating to exemption from the sales tax for certain water-efficient products for a limited period.), As Passed 2nd House   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1356, As Passed 2nd House: a negative impact of ($7,730,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2017. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 22, 2015





  TO: Honorable Dan Patrick, Lieutenant Governor, Senate      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1356 by Hinojosa (Relating to exemption from the sales tax for certain water-efficient products for a limited period.), As Passed 2nd House  

TO: Honorable Dan Patrick, Lieutenant Governor, Senate
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB1356 by Hinojosa (Relating to exemption from the sales tax for certain water-efficient products for a limited period.), As Passed 2nd House

 Honorable Dan Patrick, Lieutenant Governor, Senate 

 Honorable Dan Patrick, Lieutenant Governor, Senate 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB1356 by Hinojosa (Relating to exemption from the sales tax for certain water-efficient products for a limited period.), As Passed 2nd House

SB1356 by Hinojosa (Relating to exemption from the sales tax for certain water-efficient products for a limited period.), As Passed 2nd House

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1356, As Passed 2nd House: a negative impact of ($7,730,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2017. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1356, As Passed 2nd House: a negative impact of ($7,730,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2017.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2016 ($3,700,000)   2017 ($4,030,000)   2018 ($4,200,000)   2019 ($4,370,000)   2020 ($4,540,000)    


2016 ($3,700,000)
2017 ($4,030,000)
2018 ($4,200,000)
2019 ($4,370,000)
2020 ($4,540,000)

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue (Loss) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Revenue (Loss) fromCities Probable Revenue (Loss) fromTransit Authorities Probable Revenue (Loss) fromCounties and Special Districts   2016 ($3,700,000) ($710,000) ($230,000) ($150,000)   2017 ($4,030,000) ($720,000) ($230,000) ($150,000)   2018 ($4,200,000) ($740,000) ($240,000) ($160,000)   2019 ($4,370,000) ($840,000) ($260,000) ($160,000)   2020 ($4,540,000) ($850,000) ($260,000) ($160,000)   

  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue (Loss) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Revenue (Loss) fromCities Probable Revenue (Loss) fromTransit Authorities Probable Revenue (Loss) fromCounties and Special Districts   2016 ($3,700,000) ($710,000) ($230,000) ($150,000)   2017 ($4,030,000) ($720,000) ($230,000) ($150,000)   2018 ($4,200,000) ($740,000) ($240,000) ($160,000)   2019 ($4,370,000) ($840,000) ($260,000) ($160,000)   2020 ($4,540,000) ($850,000) ($260,000) ($160,000)  


2016 ($3,700,000) ($710,000) ($230,000) ($150,000)
2017 ($4,030,000) ($720,000) ($230,000) ($150,000)
2018 ($4,200,000) ($740,000) ($240,000) ($160,000)
2019 ($4,370,000) ($840,000) ($260,000) ($160,000)
2020 ($4,540,000) ($850,000) ($260,000) ($160,000)

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend Chapter 151 of the Tax Code, to provide for an exemption from sales and use tax of certain water-efficient products for a limited period. The bill would add Section 151.3335 to provide that a water-conserving product or WaterSense product would be exempt from the sales and use tax during the period beginning at 12:01 a.m. on the Saturday preceding the last Monday in May (Memorial Day) and ending at 11:59 p.m. on the last Monday in May. "Water-conserving product" would be defined as tangible personal property used outdoors on private residential property and not in a business or trade that may result in water conservation or groundwater retention, water table recharge, or a decrease in evaporation. The term would include a soaker or drip irrigation hose, a moisture control for sprinkler or irrigation systems, mulch, a rain barrel or alternative moisture control system, and a permeable ground cover surface. A "WaterSense product" would be as certified under the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency WaterSense program. This bill would take effect July 1, 2015, assuming it received the requisite two-thirds majority votes in both houses of the Legislature.  Otherwise, it would take effect October 1, 2015.

Methodology

National data on annual household expenditures on lawns and gardens from the National Gardening Association were apportioned to the state based on population and reduced to reflect expenditures on water-conserving items.  To estimate expenditures on WaterSense products, data were gathered from Comptroller tax files regarding the amount of taxable sales made by certain retailers selling the products subject to the provisions of the bill. The result was reduced to estimate sales that would occur during the tax exempt period, and multiplied by the sales tax rate to yield the applicable sales tax. Fiscal implications for units of local government were estimated proportionally. The fiscal impacts would be the same whether the bill takes effect July 1, 2015 or October 1, 2015.

Local Government Impact

There would be a proportional loss of sales and use tax revenue from local taxing jurisdictions as shown in the above table.

Source Agencies: 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

LBB Staff: UP, KK, SD

 UP, KK, SD