Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1356 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1356


 AN ACT
 relating to exemption from the sales tax for certain
 water-efficient products for a limited period.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 151, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 151.3335 to read as follows:
 Sec. 151.3335.  WATER-EFFICIENT PRODUCTS. (a)  In this
 section:
 (1)  "Water-conserving product":
 (A)  means tangible personal property that:
 (i)  is used on private residential property
 and is not used for business or trade; and
 (ii)  when used or planted in an outdoor
 residential property, may result in:
 (a)  water conservation or groundwater
 retention;
 (b)  water table recharge; or
 (c)  a decrease in ambient air
 temperature that limits water evaporation; and
 (B)  includes:
 (i)  a soaker or drip-irrigation hose;
 (ii)  a moisture control for a sprinkler or
 irrigation system;
 (iii)  mulch;
 (iv)  a rain barrel or an alternative rain
 and moisture collection system; and
 (v)  a permeable ground cover surface that
 allows water to reach underground basins, aquifers, or water
 collection points.  "WaterSense product" means a product that has
 been designated as a WaterSense certified product under the
 WaterSense program operated by the United States Environmental
 Protection Agency, or a similar successor program.
 (b)  The sale of a water-conserving product or WaterSense
 product is exempted from the taxes imposed by this chapter if the
 sale takes place during the period described by Section 151.333(c).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect July 1, 2015, if it
 receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each
 house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.
 If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for effect on that
 date, this Act takes effect October 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1356 passed the Senate on
 May 4, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 20, Nays 11; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 20, Nays 11.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1356 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 122,
 Nays 18, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor