Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1369 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R29675 YDB-D
 By: Zaffirini, et al. S.B. No. 1369
 (Smithee)
 Substitute the following for S.B. No. 1369:  No.


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to reports on attorney ad litem, guardian ad litem,
 guardian, mediator, and competency evaluator appointments made by
 courts in this state and an interim study on a billing system for
 attorneys ad litem.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle B, Title 2, Government Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 36 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 36.  JUDICIAL REPORTS
 Sec. 36.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Competency evaluator" means a physician or
 psychologist who is licensed or certified in this state and who
 performs examinations to determine whether an individual is
 incapacitated or has an intellectual disability for purposes of
 appointing a guardian for the individual.  The term includes
 physicians and psychologists conducting examinations under
 Sections 1101.103 and 1101.104, Estates Code.
 (2)  "Guardian" has the meaning assigned by Section
 1002.012, Estates Code.
 Sec. 36.002.  APPLICABILITY; CONFLICT OF LAW. (a)  This
 chapter applies to a court in this state created by the Texas
 Constitution, by statute, or as authorized by statute.
 (b)  To the extent of a conflict between this chapter and a
 specific provision relating to a court, this chapter controls.
 Sec. 36.003.  EXEMPTION. The reporting requirements of
 Section 36.004 do not apply to:
 (1)  a mediation conducted by an alternative dispute
 resolution system established under Chapter 152, Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code;
 (2)  an appointment made under Chapter 33, Family Code;
 (3)  a guardian ad litem or other person appointed
 under a program authorized by Section 107.031, Family Code; or
 (4)  an attorney ad litem, guardian ad litem, amicus
 attorney, or mediator appointed under a domestic relations office
 established under Chapter 203, Family Code.
 Sec. 36.004.  REPORT ON APPOINTMENTS. (a)  In addition to a
 report required by other state law or rule, the clerk of each court
 in this state shall prepare a report on court appointments for an
 attorney ad litem, guardian ad litem, guardian, mediator, or
 competency evaluator for a case before the court in the preceding
 month.  For a court that does not make an appointment in the
 preceding month, the clerk of the court must file a report
 indicating that no appointment was made by the court in that month.
 The report on court appointments must include:
 (1)  the name of each person appointed by the court as
 an attorney ad litem, guardian ad litem, guardian, mediator, or
 competency evaluator for a case in that month;
 (2)  the name of the judge and the date of the order
 approving compensation to be paid to a person appointed as an
 attorney ad litem, guardian ad litem, guardian, mediator, or
 competency evaluator for a case in that month;
 (3)  the number and style of each case in which a person
 was appointed as an attorney ad litem, guardian ad litem, guardian,
 mediator, or competency evaluator for that month;
 (4)  the number of cases each person was appointed by
 the court to serve as an attorney ad litem, guardian ad litem,
 guardian, mediator, or competency evaluator in that month;
 (5)  the total amount of compensation paid to each
 attorney ad litem, guardian ad litem, guardian, mediator, or
 competency evaluator appointed by the court in that month and the
 source of the compensation; and
 (6)  if the total amount of compensation paid to a
 person appointed to serve as an attorney ad litem, guardian ad
 litem, guardian, mediator, or competency evaluator for one
 appointed case in that month exceeds $1,000, any information
 related to the case that is available to the court on the number of
 hours billed to the court for the work performed by the person or
 the person's employees, including paralegals, and the billed
 expenses.
 (b)  Not later than the 15th day of each month, the clerk of a
 court shall:
 (1)  submit a copy of the report to the Office of Court
 Administration of the Texas Judicial System; and
 (2)  post the report at the courthouse of the county in
 which the court is located and on any Internet website of the court.
 (c)  The Office of Court Administration of the Texas Judicial
 System shall prescribe the format that courts and the clerks of the
 courts must use to report the information required by this section
 and shall post the information collected under Subsection (b) on
 the office's Internet website.
 Sec. 36.005.  FAILURE TO REPORT. If a court in this state
 fails to provide to the clerk of the court the information required
 for the report submitted under Section 36.004, the court is
 ineligible for any grant money awarded by this state or a state
 agency for the next state fiscal biennium.
 Sec. 36.006.  TEXAS JUDICIAL COUNCIL RULES. The Texas
 Judicial Council shall, as the council considers appropriate, adopt
 rules to implement this chapter.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The Office of Court Administration of the
 Texas Judicial System shall conduct a study on the feasibility of
 establishing a statewide uniform attorney ad litem billing system
 that would allow attorneys appointed by courts in this state to
 serve as attorneys ad litem in cases before the courts to enter on a
 standardized form information regarding the appointment type and
 duration, case information and activities, numbers of hours served
 under the appointment, and hourly rate or flat fee paid for the
 appointment.
 (b)  The study conducted under this section shall examine:
 (1)  the possible benefits to this state and to
 counties in this state of establishing a statewide uniform attorney
 ad litem billing system;
 (2)  the number of attorneys in this state providing
 legal representation in court-appointed matters;
 (3)  the number of hours spent in client representation
 activities by attorneys serving as attorneys ad litem;
 (4)  the qualifications of attorneys serving as
 attorneys ad litem, including training and specialization;
 (5)  whether using a standardized billing voucher would
 provide uniformity in the types of vouchers attorneys are currently
 required to submit to courts for payment; and
 (6)  the amount of money spent on court-appointed legal
 representation by year, court, county, and person served, such as
 parent, child, or other.
 (c)  Not later than December 31, 2016, the Office of Court
 Administration of the Texas Judicial System shall submit an
 electronic copy of the study conducted under this section to the
 governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of
 representatives.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 36, Government Code, as added by this
 Act, applies beginning with the state fiscal year that begins
 September 1, 2016.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.