Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB139 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Perry S.B. No. 139
 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2014; January 27, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 April 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 12,
 Nays 0; April 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to use of money in the state highway fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 222.001(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Money that is required to be used for public roadways by
 the Texas Constitution or federal law and that is deposited in the
 state treasury to the credit of the state highway fund, including
 money deposited to the credit of the state highway fund under Title
 23, United States Code, may be used only:
 (1)  to improve the state highway system; or
 (2)  to mitigate adverse environmental effects that
 result directly from construction or maintenance of a state highway
 by the department[; or
 [(3)     by the Department of Public Safety to police the
 state highway system and to administer state laws relating to
 traffic and safety on public roads].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect only if the constitutional
 amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015,
 prescribing the purposes for which revenue from motor vehicle
 registration fees, taxes on motor fuels and lubricants, and certain
 revenues received from the federal government may be used is
 approved by the voters. If that amendment is not approved by the
 voters, this Act has no effect.
 * * * * *