Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1394 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1394


 AN ACT
 relating to the presentation of evidence in appraisal review board
 hearings on protests.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 41.45, Tax Code, is amended by amending
 Subsection (h) and adding Subsection (o) to read as follows:
 (h)  Before the hearing on a protest or immediately after the
 hearing begins, the chief appraiser and the property owner or the
 owner's agent shall each provide the other with a copy of any
 written material or material preserved on any portable device
 designed to maintain an electronic, magnetic, or digital
 reproduction of a document or image that the person intends to offer
 or submit to the appraisal review board at the hearing.
 (o)  If the chief appraiser uses audiovisual equipment at a
 hearing on a protest, the appraisal office shall provide
 audiovisual equipment of the same general type, kind, and character
 for use during the hearing by the property owner or the property
 owner's agent.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2016.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1394 passed the Senate on
 April 20, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1394 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor