Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1406 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1406


 AN ACT
 relating to the protection of certain children through the
 operation of the child safety check alert list.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 261.3022, Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 261.3022.  CHILD SAFETY CHECK ALERT LIST. (a)  The
 [Subject to the availability of funds, the] Department of Public
 Safety of the State of Texas shall maintain [create] a child safety
 check alert list as part of the Texas Crime Information Center to
 help locate a child or the child's family for purposes of:
 (1)  investigating a report of child abuse or neglect;
 (2)  providing protective services to a family
 receiving family-based support services; or
 (3)  providing protective services to the family of a
 child in the managing conservatorship of the department.
 (b)  If [the child safety check alert list is established
 and] the department is unable to locate a child or the child's
 family for a purpose described by Subsection (a) after the
 department has attempted to locate the child for not more than 20
 days, the department shall notify the Texas Department of Public
 Safety that the department is unable to locate the child or the
 child's family. The notice must include the information required
 by Subsections (c)(1)-(10).
 (c)  On receipt of the notice from the department, the Texas
 Department of Public Safety shall [purposes of investigating a
 report of child abuse or neglect, after the department has
 exhausted all means available to the department for locating the
 family, the department may seek assistance under this section from
 the appropriate county attorney, district attorney, or criminal
 district attorney with responsibility for representing the
 department as provided by Section 264.009.
 [(c)     If the department requests assistance, the county
 attorney, district attorney, or criminal district attorney, as
 applicable, may file an application with the court requesting the
 issuance of an ex parte order requiring the Texas Crime Information
 Center to place the members of the family the department is
 attempting to locate on a child safety check alert list. The
 application must include a summary of:
 [(1)     the report of child abuse or neglect the
 department is attempting to investigate; and
 [(2)  the department's efforts to locate the family.
 [(d)     If the court determines after a hearing that the
 department has exhausted all means available to the department for
 locating the family, the court shall approve the application and
 order the appropriate law enforcement agency to] notify the Texas
 Crime Information Center to place the child and the child's family
 on a child safety check alert list. The alert list must include the
 following information if known or readily available:
 (1)  the name, sex, race, date of birth, any known
 identifying numbers, including social security number and driver's
 license number, and personal descriptions of the family member
 alleged to have abused or neglected a child according to the report
 the department is attempting to investigate;
 (2)  the name, sex, race, date of birth, any known
 identifying numbers, including social security number and driver's
 license number, and personal descriptions of any parent, managing
 conservator, or guardian of the child who cannot be located for the
 purposes described by Subsection (a);
 (3)  the name, sex, race, date of birth, any known
 identifying numbers, including social security number and driver's
 license number, and personal descriptions of the child who is the
 subject of the report or is receiving services described by
 Subsection (a)(2) or (3);
 (4)  if applicable, [(3)] a code identifying the type
 of child abuse or neglect alleged or determined to have been
 committed against the child;
 (5) [(4)]  the family's last known address; [and]
 (6)  any known description of the motor vehicle,
 including the vehicle's make, color, style of body, model year, and
 vehicle identification number, in which the child is suspected to
 be transported;
 (7)  the case number assigned by the department;
 (8)  the department's dedicated law-enforcement
 telephone number for statewide intake;
 (9)  the date and time when and the location where the
 child was last seen; and
 (10)  any other information required [(5) the minimum
 criteria] for an entry as established by the center.
 SECTION 2.  Section 261.3023(a), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  If a law enforcement officer encounters a person,
 including a child, listed on the Texas Crime Information Center's
 child safety check alert list [who is alleged to have abused or
 neglected a child, or encounters a child listed on the alert list
 who is the subject of a report of child abuse or neglect the
 department is attempting to investigate], the officer shall request
 information from the person or the child regarding the child's
 well-being and current residence.
 SECTION 3.  Section 261.3024(a), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  A law enforcement officer who locates a child listed on
 the Texas Crime Information Center's child safety check alert list
 [who is the subject of a report of child abuse or neglect the
 department is attempting to investigate] and who reports the
 child's current address and other relevant information to the
 department under Section 261.3023 shall report to the Texas Crime
 Information Center that the child has been located.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1406 passed the Senate on
 April 20, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1406 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 1, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor