Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB142 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/28/2015

                    By: Garcia S.B. No. 142
 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2014; January 27, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 28, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 28, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 142 By:  Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the appointment and training of volunteer deputy
 registrars.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 13, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 13.048 to read as follows:
 Sec. 13.048.  OPTIONAL PROCEDURE FOR APPOINTMENT OF
 VOLUNTEER DEPUTY REGISTRAR; PROVISION OF TRAINING MATERIALS ON
 SECRETARY OF STATE WEBSITE. (a)  A county may adopt a method of
 appointment for volunteer deputy registrars under this section that
 provides for the training and examination of potential volunteer
 deputy registrars.
 (b)  For the purposes of this section, the secretary of state
 shall:
 (1)  provide on the secretary of state's website the
 training materials prescribed by the secretary of state under
 Section 13.047 for volunteer deputy registrars; and
 (2)  prescribe and make available on the secretary of
 state's website an examination based on those materials.
 (c)  A county that has adopted the method under this section:
 (1)  shall administer the required examination to a
 potential volunteer deputy registrar at any time during the county
 voter registrar's regular business hours; and
 (2)  is not required to hold in-person training
 sessions for potential volunteer deputy registrars.
 (d)  At the time a person satisfactorily completes the
 examination in compliance with standards adopted by the secretary
 of state, the registrar shall appoint the person as a volunteer
 deputy registrar and advise the person:
 (1)  of county-specific procedures for processing
 voter registration applications, if applicable; and
 (2)  that the only requirements for voter registration
 are those prescribed by state law or by the secretary of state.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *