Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1436 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1436
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 18, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 7, 2015, rereferred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 29, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 1; April 29, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the setback requirements for a junkyard or an
 automotive wrecking and salvage yard.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 396.022(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A junkyard or an automotive wrecking and salvage yard
 may not be located:
 (1)  within 50 feet of the right-of-way of a public
 street or[,] state highway;[,] or
 (2)  within 50 feet of the nearest property line of a
 residence.
 SECTION 2.  Section 396.022(a), Transportation Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies only to a junkyard or an automotive
 wrecking and salvage yard that begins operating on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A junkyard or an automotive wrecking
 and salvage yard operating before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law applicable immediately before the effective
 date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *