Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1436 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1436


 AN ACT
 relating to the setback requirements for a junkyard or an
 automotive wrecking and salvage yard; amending provisions subject
 to a criminal penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 396.022(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A junkyard or an automotive wrecking and salvage yard
 may not be located:
 (1)  within 50 feet of the right-of-way of a public
 street or[,] state highway;[,] or
 (2)  within 50 feet of the nearest property line of a
 residence.
 SECTION 2.  Section 396.022(a), Transportation Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies only to a junkyard or an automotive
 wrecking and salvage yard that begins operating on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A junkyard or an automotive wrecking
 and salvage yard operating before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law applicable immediately before the effective
 date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1436 passed the Senate on
 May 4, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 20, Nays 11; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 24, Nays 7.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1436 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 96,
 Nays 42, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor