Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1453 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/22/2015

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1453
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 19, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain municipalities to propose a
 fire control, prevention, and emergency medical services district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 344.051, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a-2)  The governing body of a municipality may propose the
 creation of a fire control, prevention, and emergency medical
 services district under this chapter if the municipality is located
 in the extraterritorial jurisdiction of another municipality that
 has a population of 200,000 or more, both of which are located in a
 county with a population of less than 300,000 that is located on the
 international border.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *