Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1464 Senate Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 17, 2015      TO: Honorable Donna Campbell, Chair, Senate Committee on Veteran Affairs & Military Installations      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1464 by Lucio (Relating to the creation of the transnational and organized crime division within the office of the attorney general.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1464, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: a negative impact of ($1,693,183) through the biennium ending August 31, 2017. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 17, 2015





  TO: Honorable Donna Campbell, Chair, Senate Committee on Veteran Affairs & Military Installations      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1464 by Lucio (Relating to the creation of the transnational and organized crime division within the office of the attorney general.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Donna Campbell, Chair, Senate Committee on Veteran Affairs & Military Installations
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB1464 by Lucio (Relating to the creation of the transnational and organized crime division within the office of the attorney general.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Donna Campbell, Chair, Senate Committee on Veteran Affairs & Military Installations 

 Honorable Donna Campbell, Chair, Senate Committee on Veteran Affairs & Military Installations 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB1464 by Lucio (Relating to the creation of the transnational and organized crime division within the office of the attorney general.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

SB1464 by Lucio (Relating to the creation of the transnational and organized crime division within the office of the attorney general.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1464, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: a negative impact of ($1,693,183) through the biennium ending August 31, 2017. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1464, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: a negative impact of ($1,693,183) through the biennium ending August 31, 2017.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2016 ($959,403)   2017 ($733,780)   2018 ($733,780)   2019 ($733,780)   2020 ($733,780)    


2016 ($959,403)
2017 ($733,780)
2018 ($733,780)
2019 ($733,780)
2020 ($733,780)

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2015   2016 ($959,403) 7.0   2017 ($733,780) 7.0   2018 ($733,780) 7.0   2019 ($733,780) 7.0   2020 ($733,780) 7.0   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2015   2016 ($959,403) 7.0   2017 ($733,780) 7.0   2018 ($733,780) 7.0   2019 ($733,780) 7.0   2020 ($733,780) 7.0  


2016 ($959,403) 7.0
2017 ($733,780) 7.0
2018 ($733,780) 7.0
2019 ($733,780) 7.0
2020 ($733,780) 7.0

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend the Government Code to establish a Transnational and Organized Crime Division within the Office of the Attorney General (OAG) to provide prosecutorial and investigative assistance to certain law enforcement agencies and prosecutors. Additionally, the bill would direct the Transnational and Organized Crime Division to develop certain assistance initiatives.Under the bill provisions, the OAG indicated the fiscal impact would be $959,403 in fiscal year 2016 and $733,780 each fiscal year from 2017-2020. Costs include salaries for 7.0 FTEs, general operating, travel, capital equipment, and benefits.The bill would take effect on September 1, 2015 and the OAG would be required to establish theTransnational and Organized Crime Division no later than December 1, 2015.

Methodology

Currently, the OAG provides prosecutorial and investigative assistance to local and state agencies in Texas. Under the bill provisions, the Criminal Prosecutions Division within the OAG estimates twenty additional cases each fiscal year related to human trafficking, organized crime, and border security. The Human Trafficking Unit estimates an additional four to six operations related to human trafficking, organized crime, and border security.The OAG estimates the bill provisions would require one Assistant Attorney General III (1.0 FTE), one Assistant Attorney General V (1.0 FTE), one Legal Assistant III (1.0 FTE), three Investigator V (3.0 FTEs), and one Information Specialist III (1.0 FTE) with a combined fiscal year cost of $613,302 for salaries ($489,099) and related benefits ($155,203) related to expanded prosecutorial and investigative assistance for border security, organized crime, and human trafficking.The additional investigators would be commissioned peace officers and require specialized equipment such as weapons, radios, safety equipment, and vehicles. The OAG estimates travel associated with the bill provisions would be greater than average due to potential investigations and prosecution assistance. Additionally, the OAG estimates they would not be able house the additional personnel in existing office space and would be required to lease space.

Technology

There would be a technology impact related to computer hardware, software, telecommunications equipment, and network storage estimated to be $35,905 in fiscal year 2016 and $16,380 in subsequent years.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 302 Office of the Attorney General

302 Office of the Attorney General

LBB Staff: UP, FR, EP, TBo

 UP, FR, EP, TBo