Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1466 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1466
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 19, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 7, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 7, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1466 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of medical schools for medical residency
 programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.501(1), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (1)  "Medical school" means the medical school at The
 University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston, the medical
 school at The University of Texas Southwestern Medical [Health
 Science] Center [at Dallas], the medical school at The University
 of Texas Health Science Center at San Antonio, The University of
 Texas Medical Branch at Galveston, the medical school at The
 University of Texas at Austin, the medical school at The University
 of Texas Rio Grande Valley, the medical education program of The
 University of Texas Health Science Center at Tyler, the medical
 school at the Texas Tech University Health Sciences Center, the
 medical school at the Texas Tech University Health Sciences Center
 at El Paso, the Baylor College of Medicine, the college of
 osteopathic medicine at the University of North Texas Health
 Science Center at Fort Worth, or the medical school at the Texas A&M
 University Health Science Center [Medical Program].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *