Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1475 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 7, 2015      TO: Honorable Charles Schwertner, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1475 by Garcia (Relating to establishing an enhanced Medicaid managed care consumer support system.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1475, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($5,093,553) through the biennium ending August 31, 2017. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 7, 2015





  TO: Honorable Charles Schwertner, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1475 by Garcia (Relating to establishing an enhanced Medicaid managed care consumer support system.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Charles Schwertner, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB1475 by Garcia (Relating to establishing an enhanced Medicaid managed care consumer support system.), As Introduced

 Honorable Charles Schwertner, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Honorable Charles Schwertner, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB1475 by Garcia (Relating to establishing an enhanced Medicaid managed care consumer support system.), As Introduced

SB1475 by Garcia (Relating to establishing an enhanced Medicaid managed care consumer support system.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1475, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($5,093,553) through the biennium ending August 31, 2017. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1475, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($5,093,553) through the biennium ending August 31, 2017.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2016 ($2,557,079)   2017 ($2,536,474)   2018 ($2,536,474)   2019 ($2,536,474)   2020 ($2,536,474)    


2016 ($2,557,079)
2017 ($2,536,474)
2018 ($2,536,474)
2019 ($2,536,474)
2020 ($2,536,474)

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable (Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable (Cost) fromFederal Funds555  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2015   2016 ($2,557,079) ($2,557,080) 6.1   2017 ($2,536,474) ($2,536,474) 6.1   2018 ($2,536,474) ($2,536,474) 6.1   2019 ($2,536,474) ($2,536,474) 6.1   2020 ($2,536,474) ($2,536,474) 6.1   

  Fiscal Year Probable (Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable (Cost) fromFederal Funds555  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2015   2016 ($2,557,079) ($2,557,080) 6.1   2017 ($2,536,474) ($2,536,474) 6.1   2018 ($2,536,474) ($2,536,474) 6.1   2019 ($2,536,474) ($2,536,474) 6.1   2020 ($2,536,474) ($2,536,474) 6.1  


2016 ($2,557,079) ($2,557,080) 6.1
2017 ($2,536,474) ($2,536,474) 6.1
2018 ($2,536,474) ($2,536,474) 6.1
2019 ($2,536,474) ($2,536,474) 6.1
2020 ($2,536,474) ($2,536,474) 6.1

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to establish an enhanced Medicaid managed care consumer support system no later than January 1, 2016. The bill would direct HHSC to request any federal waiver or authorization necessary to implement the provisions of the bill and authorizes the agency to delay implementation of any provision until such waiver or authorization is granted. The bill would take effect immediately if a two-thirds majority vote in both houses of the Legislature is received. Otherwise, the bill would take effect on September 1, 2015.

Methodology

According to HHSC, 6.1 full time-equivalents (FTEs) would be needed to implement the Medicaid managed care consumer support system at a cost of $629,159 in fiscal year 2016 and $587,948 in fiscal years 2017 through 2020. Additionally, HHSC estimates 65 contracted community partners (five in each of the 13 Medicaid managed care service areas) would be required to provide the regional network at a cost of $69,000 per partner, or $4,485,000 annually.

Technology

There would be technology costs related to the new FTEs of $20,520 in fiscal year 2016, and $16,964 in fiscal year 2017 and each subsequent year.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 529 Health and Human Services Commission

529 Health and Human Services Commission

LBB Staff: UP, NB, WP, LR, CH

 UP, NB, WP, LR, CH