Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1510 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/06/2015

                    By: Hancock S.B. No. 1510
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 23, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; May 6, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 May 6, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1510 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authority of the county auditor to examine and audit the
 records of certain special districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 115, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 115.0036 to read as follows:
 Sec. 115.0036.  EXAMINATION AND AUDIT OF RECORDS OF CERTAIN
 SPECIAL DISTRICTS. (a)  The county auditor shall have continual
 access to and may, at the county auditor's discretion, examine the
 books, accounts, reports, vouchers, and any other records of:
 (1)  a special district if the district's budget
 requires the approval of the commissioners court; and
 (2)  any subsidiary of a special district described by
 Subdivision (1) that is supported wholly or partly by public funds.
 (b)  The county auditor, with the approval of the
 commissioners court, may audit the books, accounts, reports,
 vouchers, and any other records of an entity described by
 Subsection (a) if the county auditor determines an audit is
 necessary after conducting an examination under Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *