Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1510 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1510


 AN ACT
 relating to authority of the county auditor to examine and audit the
 records of certain special districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 115, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 115.0036 to read as follows:
 Sec. 115.0036.  EXAMINATION AND AUDIT OF RECORDS OF CERTAIN
 SPECIAL DISTRICTS. (a)  The county auditor shall have continual
 access to and may, at the county auditor's discretion, examine the
 books, accounts, reports, vouchers, and any other records of:
 (1)  a special district if the district's budget
 requires the approval of the commissioners court; and
 (2)  any subsidiary of a special district described by
 Subdivision (1) that is supported wholly or partly by public funds.
 (b)  The county auditor, with the approval of the
 commissioners court, may audit the books, accounts, reports,
 vouchers, and any other records of an entity described by
 Subsection (a) if the county auditor determines an audit is
 necessary after conducting an examination under Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1510 passed the Senate on
 May 11, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1510 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor