Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1529 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2015

                    By: Burton S.B. No. 1529
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 23, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 20, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation and regulation of a law enforcement agency
 or police department.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1701.163, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The entity may not begin operation of the law
 enforcement agency or police department unless:
 (1)  the entity submits all of the information required
 under Subsection (b) to the commission; and
 (2)  the commission issues the entity an agency number
 for the law enforcement agency or police department.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1701.1631 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1701.1631.  SUSPENSION OF OPERATIONS OF CERTAIN
 AGENCIES OR DEPARTMENTS. The commission may suspend the operations
 of a law enforcement agency or police department described by
 Section 1701.163 if the entity creating the law enforcement agency
 or police department:
 (1)  cannot demonstrate an ongoing need for the law
 enforcement agency or police department in the community;
 (2)  does not maintain adequate funding for the law
 enforcement agency or police department;
 (3)  does not maintain or provide adequate physical
 resources for officers of the law enforcement agency or police
 department;
 (4)  does not maintain or provide adequate physical
 facilities for the law enforcement agency or police department,
 including an adequate evidence room, dispatch area, and public
 area;
 (5)  does not maintain or enforce adequate law
 enforcement policies for the law enforcement agency or police
 department, including policies on:
 (A)  use of force;
 (B)  vehicle pursuit;
 (C)  professional conduct of officers;
 (D)  domestic abuse protocols;
 (E)  response to missing persons;
 (F)  supervision of part-time officers; and
 (G)  impartial policing;
 (6)  does not have an effective administrative
 structure for the law enforcement agency or police department;
 (7)  does not maintain adequate liability insurance for
 the law enforcement agency or police department; or
 (8)  does not meet another standard or requirement the
 commission implements by rule.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *