Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1532 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2015

                    By: Burton, Campbell S.B. No. 1532
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 23, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and
 Military Installations; April 20, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays
 0; April 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1532 By:  Burton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the appointment of an associate commissioner for
 veterans services at the Health and Human Services Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.0058 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.0058.  ASSOCIATE COMMISSIONER FOR VETERANS
 SERVICES. The executive commissioner shall appoint for the
 commission an associate commissioner for veterans services to:
 (1)  review programs and benefits available for
 veterans;
 (2)  make recommendations on the improvement and
 coordination of veterans services; and
 (3)  coordinate with other state agencies to enhance
 veterans services.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *