Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1553 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/22/2015

                    By: Eltife S.B. No. 1553
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 23, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 22, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 22, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1553 By:  Eltife


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the interests of certain holding companies in certain
 repair facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2307.002, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsections (e) and (f) to read as follows:
 (e)  A holding company that owns an insurer may acquire, own,
 and operate an interest in a repair facility through a person, other
 than an insurer, who is an affiliate or subsidiary of the holding
 company. The facility must be licensed as a new motor vehicle
 dealership under Chapter 2301.
 (f)  For purposes of Subsection (e), "holding company" and
 "insurer" have the meanings assigned by Section 823.002, Insurance
 Code.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by Section 2307.002(e),
 Occupations Code, as added by this Act, applies only to the
 acquisition, ownership, or operation of an interest in a repair
 facility on or after the effective date of this Act. Acquisition,
 ownership, or operation of an interest in a repair facility before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law as it existed
 before that date, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *