Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1563 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/22/2015

                    By: Eltife S.B. No. 1563
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 23, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 22, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 April 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1563 By:  Menéndez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the TexAmericas Center to incorporate
 a nonprofit corporation for certain purposes and to the tax
 treatment of such a nonprofit corporation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 3503, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 3503.111 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 3503.111.  NONPROFIT CORPORATIONS. (a)  The authority
 may authorize by resolution the incorporation of a nonprofit
 corporation under the Business Organizations Code to exercise the
 powers granted to the authority.  A corporation created under this
 section must be a nonmember, nonstock corporation.
 (b)  Each nonprofit corporation created under this section
 may:
 (1)  acquire and hold title to real property and
 improvements to that property; and
 (2)  collect and remit to the authority income, less
 expenses, from that real property and from improvements to that
 property.
 (c)  The board shall appoint the board of directors of each
 nonprofit corporation created under this section.  A board member
 is not required to reside in the authority.
 (d)  A board member or employee of the authority may
 simultaneously serve as a member of the board of directors of a
 nonprofit corporation.  A person serving as a board member of the
 authority and of a nonprofit corporation created by the authority
 may participate in all votes relating to the business of the
 authority or the corporation, regardless of any statutory
 prohibition.
 SECTION 2.  Section 3503.154, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 3503.154.  EXEMPTION FROM TAXATION. The property,
 revenue, and income of the authority and of each nonprofit
 corporation created under Section 3503.111 are exempt from all
 taxes imposed by the state or a political subdivision of the state.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *