Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1580 Introduced / Analysis

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   S.B. 1580     84R9982 ADM-F   By: Garcia         Veteran Affairs & Military Installations         4/20/2015         As Filed    

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 1580
84R9982 ADM-F By: Garcia
 Veteran Affairs & Military Installations
 4/20/2015
 As Filed

Senate Research Center

S.B. 1580

84R9982 ADM-F

By: Garcia

 

Veteran Affairs & Military Installations

 

4/20/2015

 

As Filed

       AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   Texas ranks amongst the highest population of homeless youth and is the state with the third highest homeless veteran population in the United States. On a given night in 2014, Texas had 190,018 homeless youth and 2,718 homeless veterans. Texas is among the most vibrant economies in the nation. A study to examine homelessness would begin a process for the state to address this problem and allow for all Texans to prosper.    Those who are homeless are vulnerable to human trafficking, mental illness, high rates of chronic health problems, and other negative conditions that can be correlated with an unstable and dangerous living environment. The constant barrage of stressful and traumatic experiences also has profound effects on a persons ability to cope, develop, and learn.    S.B. 1580 seeks to determine the scope of the problem for a more accurate depiction of the challenges that homeless people face and possibly more viable solutions for two of Texas' most vulnerable populations, homeless youth and veterans.   As proposed, S.B. 1580 amends current law relating to studies on homeless veterans and youth.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1.  Amends Chapter 2306, Government Code, by adding Subchapter OO, as follows:   SUBCHAPTER OO. HOMELESS VETERANS AND YOUTH   Sec. 2306.1101.  DEFINITIONS. Defines "homeless veteran" and "homeless youth."   Sec. 2306.1102.  STUDY ON HOMELESS VETERANS. (a) Requires the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs (TDHCA), in conjunction with the Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS), the Texas Veterans Commission (TVC), the Texas Workforce Commission (TWC), and the Texas Homeless Education Office (office), to conduct a study on homeless veterans.   (b)  Requires TDHCA, in conducting the study, to:   (1)  collect data on the number of homeless veterans in this state;   (2)  examine the needs of homeless veterans and the degree to which current programs are meeting those needs; and   (3)  identify any sources of funding that might be available to provide services to homeless veterans.   (c)  Requires TDHCA to submit a report on the study to the legislature not later than December 1, 2016. Requires that the report include a summary of the information resulting from the study and recommendations for changes in law necessary to provide services to or otherwise assist homeless veterans.   Sec. 2306.1103.  STUDY ON HOMELESS YOUTH. (a) Requires TDHCA, in conjunction with DFPS, the Texas Education Agency, and the office, to conduct a study on homeless youth.   (b)  Requires TDHCA, in conducting the study, to:   (1)  collect data on the number of homeless youth in this state;   (2)  examine the needs of homeless youth and the degree to which current programs are meeting those needs; and   (3)  identify any sources of funding that might be available to provide services to homeless youth.   (c)  Requires TDHCA to submit a report on the study to the legislature not later than December 1, 2016. Requires that the report include a summary of the information resulting from the study and recommendations for changes in law necessary to provide services to or otherwise assist homeless youth.   Sec. 2306.1104.  EXPIRATION. Provides that this subchapter expires September 1, 2017.   SECTION 2.  Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2015. 

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

Texas ranks amongst the highest population of homeless youth and is the state with the third highest homeless veteran population in the United States. On a given night in 2014, Texas had 190,018 homeless youth and 2,718 homeless veterans. Texas is among the most vibrant economies in the nation. A study to examine homelessness would begin a process for the state to address this problem and allow for all Texans to prosper. 

 

Those who are homeless are vulnerable to human trafficking, mental illness, high rates of chronic health problems, and other negative conditions that can be correlated with an unstable and dangerous living environment. The constant barrage of stressful and traumatic experiences also has profound effects on a persons ability to cope, develop, and learn. 

 

S.B. 1580 seeks to determine the scope of the problem for a more accurate depiction of the challenges that homeless people face and possibly more viable solutions for two of Texas' most vulnerable populations, homeless youth and veterans.

 

As proposed, S.B. 1580 amends current law relating to studies on homeless veterans and youth.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1.  Amends Chapter 2306, Government Code, by adding Subchapter OO, as follows:

 

SUBCHAPTER OO. HOMELESS VETERANS AND YOUTH

 

Sec. 2306.1101.  DEFINITIONS. Defines "homeless veteran" and "homeless youth."

 

Sec. 2306.1102.  STUDY ON HOMELESS VETERANS. (a) Requires the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs (TDHCA), in conjunction with the Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS), the Texas Veterans Commission (TVC), the Texas Workforce Commission (TWC), and the Texas Homeless Education Office (office), to conduct a study on homeless veterans.

 

(b)  Requires TDHCA, in conducting the study, to:

 

(1)  collect data on the number of homeless veterans in this state;

 

(2)  examine the needs of homeless veterans and the degree to which current programs are meeting those needs; and

 

(3)  identify any sources of funding that might be available to provide services to homeless veterans.

 

(c)  Requires TDHCA to submit a report on the study to the legislature not later than December 1, 2016. Requires that the report include a summary of the information resulting from the study and recommendations for changes in law necessary to provide services to or otherwise assist homeless veterans.

 

Sec. 2306.1103.  STUDY ON HOMELESS YOUTH. (a) Requires TDHCA, in conjunction with DFPS, the Texas Education Agency, and the office, to conduct a study on homeless youth.

 

(b)  Requires TDHCA, in conducting the study, to:

 

(1)  collect data on the number of homeless youth in this state;

 

(2)  examine the needs of homeless youth and the degree to which current programs are meeting those needs; and

 

(3)  identify any sources of funding that might be available to provide services to homeless youth.

 

(c)  Requires TDHCA to submit a report on the study to the legislature not later than December 1, 2016. Requires that the report include a summary of the information resulting from the study and recommendations for changes in law necessary to provide services to or otherwise assist homeless youth.

 

Sec. 2306.1104.  EXPIRATION. Provides that this subchapter expires September 1, 2017.

 

SECTION 2.  Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2015.