Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1580 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Garcia S.B. No. 1580
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 23, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and
 Military Installations; May 4, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; May 4, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1580 By:  Garcia


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study on homeless veterans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2306, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter OO to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER OO.  HOMELESS VETERANS
 Sec. 2306.1101.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter, "homeless
 veteran" means a person who has served on active duty in the armed
 forces of the United States or in the state military forces as
 defined by Section 437.001 and who:
 (1)  lacks a fixed, regular, and adequate nighttime
 residence, including a person who:
 (A)  is temporarily allowed to stay in the house
 of another person due to loss of housing;
 (B)  is temporarily living in a motel or hotel;
 (C)  is living in an emergency shelter; or
 (D)  will lose housing in less than 15 days;
 (2)  has a primary nighttime residence that is a public
 or private place not designed or ordinarily used as a regular
 sleeping accommodation for humans; or
 (3)  is living in a car, park, other public space,
 abandoned building, substandard housing, bus or train station, or
 similar setting.
 Sec. 2306.1102.  STUDY ON HOMELESS VETERANS. (a)  The
 department, in conjunction with other members of the Texas
 Interagency Council for the Homeless established under Subchapter
 KK, shall conduct a study and prepare a report on homeless veterans.
 The report must include a summary of the information resulting from
 the study and recommendations for changes in law necessary to
 provide services to or otherwise assist homeless veterans.
 (b)  In preparing the report required under this section, the
 department shall:
 (1)  compile existing data on the number of homeless
 veterans in this state;
 (2)  summarize existing studies regarding the needs of
 homeless veterans and identify the degree to which current programs
 are meeting those needs;
 (3)  identify existing sources of funding available to
 members of the Texas Interagency Council for the Homeless to
 provide housing and services to homeless veterans; and
 (4)  develop recommendations for reducing veteran
 homelessness in the state.
 (c)  The department shall submit the report required by this
 section to the legislature not later than December 1, 2016.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *