Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1580 Enrolled / Analysis

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   S.B. 1580         By: Garcia; Menndez         Veteran Affairs & Military Installations         7/23/2015         Enrolled    

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 1580
 By: Garcia; Menndez
 Veteran Affairs & Military Installations
 7/23/2015
 Enrolled

Senate Research Center

S.B. 1580

 

By: Garcia; Menndez

 

Veteran Affairs & Military Installations

 

7/23/2015

 

Enrolled

       AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   Texas ranks amongst the highest population of homeless youth and is the state with the third highest homeless veteran population in the United States. On a given night in 2014, Texas had 190,018 homeless youth and 2,718 homeless veterans. Texas is among the most vibrant economies in the nation. A study to examine homelessness would begin a process for the state to address this problem and allow for all Texans to prosper.    Those who are homeless are vulnerable to human trafficking, mental illness, high rates of chronic health problems, and other negative conditions that can be correlated with an unstable and dangerous living environment. The constant barrage of stressful and traumatic experiences also has profound effects on a persons ability to cope, develop, and learn.    S.B. 1580 seeks to determine the scope of the problem for a more accurate depiction of the challenges that homeless people face and possibly more viable solutions for two of Texas' most vulnerable populations, homeless youth and veterans.    S.B. 1580 amends current law relating to a study on homeless veterans.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1.  Amends Chapter 2306, Government Code, by adding Subchapter OO, as follows:   SUBCHAPTER OO. HOMELESS VETERANS   Sec. 2306.1101.  STUDY ON HOMELESS VETERANS. (a) Requires the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs (TDHCA), in conjunction with other members of the Texas Interagency Council for the Homeless (council) established under Subchapter KK (Interagency Council for the Homeless), to conduct a study and prepare a report on homeless veterans.    (b) Requires that the report prepared under this section:   (1) include a summary of the information resulting from the study;   (2) note any significant assumptions made in preparing the report, including the definition of "homelessness" that was used to prepare the report and the reason that definition was used;   (3) summarize the status of the homeless veteran population in this state and note any trends observed in the previous three calendar years;   (4) based on input from the Texas Veterans Commission and the Texas Interagency Council for the Homeless, describe the statewide and major local entities serving homeless veteran populations, and the funding sources of those entities; and   (5) provide recommendations, including recommendations made by the Texas Interagency Council for the Homeless, to improve the effectiveness of this state's approach to addressing homelessness among veterans, including any recommended changes to state law.   (c) Requires TDHCA to submit the report required by this section to the legislature not later than December 1, 2016.   (d) Provides that this subchapter expires September 1, 2017.   SECTION 2.  Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2015. 

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

Texas ranks amongst the highest population of homeless youth and is the state with the third highest homeless veteran population in the United States. On a given night in 2014, Texas had 190,018 homeless youth and 2,718 homeless veterans. Texas is among the most vibrant economies in the nation. A study to examine homelessness would begin a process for the state to address this problem and allow for all Texans to prosper. 

 

Those who are homeless are vulnerable to human trafficking, mental illness, high rates of chronic health problems, and other negative conditions that can be correlated with an unstable and dangerous living environment. The constant barrage of stressful and traumatic experiences also has profound effects on a persons ability to cope, develop, and learn. 

 

S.B. 1580 seeks to determine the scope of the problem for a more accurate depiction of the challenges that homeless people face and possibly more viable solutions for two of Texas' most vulnerable populations, homeless youth and veterans. 

 

S.B. 1580 amends current law relating to a study on homeless veterans.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1.  Amends Chapter 2306, Government Code, by adding Subchapter OO, as follows:

 

SUBCHAPTER OO. HOMELESS VETERANS

 

Sec. 2306.1101.  STUDY ON HOMELESS VETERANS. (a) Requires the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs (TDHCA), in conjunction with other members of the Texas Interagency Council for the Homeless (council) established under Subchapter KK (Interagency Council for the Homeless), to conduct a study and prepare a report on homeless veterans. 

 

(b) Requires that the report prepared under this section:

 

(1) include a summary of the information resulting from the study;

 

(2) note any significant assumptions made in preparing the report, including the definition of "homelessness" that was used to prepare the report and the reason that definition was used;

 

(3) summarize the status of the homeless veteran population in this state and note any trends observed in the previous three calendar years;

 

(4) based on input from the Texas Veterans Commission and the Texas Interagency Council for the Homeless, describe the statewide and major local entities serving homeless veteran populations, and the funding sources of those entities; and

 

(5) provide recommendations, including recommendations made by the Texas Interagency Council for the Homeless, to improve the effectiveness of this state's approach to addressing homelessness among veterans, including any recommended changes to state law.

 

(c) Requires TDHCA to submit the report required by this section to the legislature not later than December 1, 2016.

 

(d) Provides that this subchapter expires September 1, 2017.

 

SECTION 2.  Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2015.