Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1580 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1580


 AN ACT
 relating to a study on homeless veterans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2306, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter OO to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER OO.  HOMELESS VETERANS
 Sec. 2306.1101.  STUDY ON HOMELESS VETERANS. (a)  The
 department, in conjunction with other members of the Texas
 Interagency Council for the Homeless established under Subchapter
 KK, shall conduct a study and prepare a report on homeless veterans.
 (b)  The report prepared under this section must:
 (1)  include a summary of the information resulting
 from the study;
 (2)  note any significant assumptions made in preparing
 the report, including the definition of "homelessness" that was
 used to prepare the report and the reason that definition was used;
 (3)  summarize the status of the homeless veteran
 population in this state and note any trends observed in the
 previous three calendar years;
 (4)  based on input from the Texas Veterans Commission
 and the Texas Interagency Council for the Homeless, describe the
 statewide and major local entities serving homeless veteran
 populations, and the funding sources of those entities; and
 (5)  provide recommendations, including
 recommendations made by the Texas Interagency Council for the
 Homeless, to improve the effectiveness of this state's approach to
 addressing homelessness among veterans, including any recommended
 changes to state law.
 (c)  The department shall submit the report required by this
 section to the legislature not later than December 1, 2016.
 (d)  This subchapter expires September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1580 passed the Senate on
 May 13, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1580 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 111,
 Nays 31, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor