Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1589 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/09/2015

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1589
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 23, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and
 Economic Development; April 9, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11,
 Nays 0; April 9, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1589 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requirements for reporting unclaimed mineral proceeds
 to the comptroller of public accounts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 74.101, Property Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  A holder of mineral proceeds under Chapter 75 that is
 regulated by the Railroad Commission of Texas under Chapter 91,
 Natural Resources Code, shall include in the property report for
 the proceeds, in addition to the information listed in Subsection
 (c), the following information with respect to each well the
 production from which resulted in the proceeds:
 (1)  the lease, property, or well name;
 (2)  any lease, property, or well identification number
 used to identify the lease, property, or well;
 (3)  the county in which the lease, property, or well is
 located;
 (4)  the survey name for the location of the well; and
 (5)  from the Railroad Commission of Texas Form W-1
 (Application for Permit to Drill, Deepen, Plug-back or Re-enter):
 (A)  the General Land Office abstract number for
 the location of the well; and
 (B)  the global positioning system coordinates
 for the location of the well.
 SECTION 2.  Section 74.101(e), Property Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to a report filed on or after the effective
 date of this Act. A report filed before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law as it existed immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2016.
 * * * * *