Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1593 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 1593
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 23, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 23, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 23, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to regulation of fireworks by certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 217.042, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), the [The]
 municipality may define and prohibit any nuisance within the limits
 of the municipality and within 5,000 feet outside the limits.
 (c)  The municipality may define and prohibit as a nuisance
 the sale or use of a firework or similar material only within the
 limits of the municipality.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *