Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1593 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1593


 AN ACT
 relating to regulation of the sale of fireworks by certain
 municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 217.042, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), the [The]
 municipality may define and prohibit any nuisance within the limits
 of the municipality and within 5,000 feet outside the limits.
 (c)  The municipality may not define and prohibit as a
 nuisance the sale of fireworks or similar materials outside the
 limits of the municipality.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1593 passed the Senate on
 May 5, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1;
 May 20, 2015, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 24, 2015, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2015, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1593 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 12, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 142,
 Nays 2, two present not voting; May 24, 2015, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 29, 2015, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 1, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor