Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB161 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/05/2015

                    By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 161
 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2014; January 27, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 May 5, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 5, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 161 By:  Rodríguez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study regarding the costs of educating students of
 limited English proficiency in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 29.068 to read as follows:
 Sec. 29.068.  STUDY REGARDING COSTS OF EDUCATING STUDENTS OF
 LIMITED ENGLISH PROFICIENCY; REPORT. (a)  The agency shall conduct
 a study to examine the costs of educating a student of limited
 English proficiency in public schools.  The study must:
 (1)  determine whether the bilingual education
 allotment under Section 42.153 provides adequate funding to schools
 for meeting the educational needs of students of limited English
 proficiency;
 (2)  if it is determined under Subdivision (1) that the
 bilingual education allotment is inadequate, determine the amount
 of adjustment for the bilingual education allotment that would
 provide adequate funding to schools for meeting the educational
 needs of students of limited English proficiency; and
 (3)  determine whether the educational needs of
 students of limited English proficiency and the costs of meeting
 those needs vary by grade level from kindergarten through the 12th
 grade.
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2016, the agency shall prepare
 a report detailing the results of the study under this section and
 submit the report to each standing legislative committee with
 primary jurisdiction over primary and secondary education.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *