Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1624 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 1624
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 23, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 May 7, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 2; May 7, 2015, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1624 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement that certain entering students at a
 general academic teaching institution receive information
 regarding mental health and suicide prevention services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.9194 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.9194.  REQUIRED INFORMATION FOR ENTERING STUDENTS
 REGARDING MENTAL HEALTH AND SUICIDE PREVENTION SERVICES.  (a)  A
 general academic teaching institution shall provide to each
 entering full-time undergraduate, graduate, or professional
 student, including each full-time undergraduate, graduate, or
 professional student who transfers to the institution, information
 about:
 (1)  available mental health and suicide prevention
 services offered by the institution or by any associated
 organizations or programs; and
 (2)  early warning signs that are often present in and
 appropriate intervention for a person who may be considering
 suicide.
 (b)  The information required under this section:
 (1)  may be provided through:
 (A)  a live presentation; or
 (B)  a format that allows for student interaction,
 such as an online program or video, and that lasts not more than 15
 minutes; and
 (2)  may not be provided in a paper format only.
 SECTION 2.  Section 51.9194, Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies to full-time entering students who are admitted
 to an undergraduate, graduate, or professional degree program at a
 general academic teaching institution beginning with the 2016 fall
 semester.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *