Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1624 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1624


 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement that certain entering students at a
 general academic teaching institution receive information
 regarding mental health and suicide prevention services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.9194 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.9194.  REQUIRED INFORMATION FOR ENTERING STUDENTS
 REGARDING MENTAL HEALTH AND SUICIDE PREVENTION SERVICES.  (a)  A
 general academic teaching institution shall provide to each
 entering full-time undergraduate, graduate, or professional
 student, including each full-time undergraduate, graduate, or
 professional student who transfers to the institution, information
 about:
 (1)  available mental health and suicide prevention
 services offered by the institution or by any associated
 organizations or programs; and
 (2)  early warning signs that are often present in and
 appropriate intervention for a person who may be considering
 suicide.
 (b)  The information required under this section:
 (1)  may be provided through:
 (A)  a live presentation; or
 (B)  a format that allows for student interaction,
 such as an online program or video; and
 (2)  may not be provided in a paper format only.
 SECTION 2.  Section 51.9194, Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies to full-time entering students who are admitted
 to an undergraduate, graduate, or professional degree program at a
 general academic teaching institution beginning with the 2016 fall
 semester.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1624 passed the Senate on
 May 13, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 21, Nays 10; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 20, Nays 11.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1624 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 129,
 Nays 15, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor