Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1626 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/16/2015

                    By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 1626
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 23, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 16, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0, 1 present not
 voting; April 16, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1626 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation by a developer of the installation of
 solar energy devices in a residential subdivision.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 202.010(a), Property Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (1-a) to read as follows:
 (1-a)  "Residential unit" means a structure or part of
 a structure intended for use as a single residence and that is:
 (A)  a single-family house; or
 (B)  a separate living unit in a duplex, a
 triplex, or a quadplex.
 SECTION 2.  Section 202.010(f), Property Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (f)  During the development period for a development with
 fewer than 51 planned residential units, the declarant may prohibit
 or restrict a property owner from installing a solar energy device.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *