Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1634 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/29/2015

                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 1634
 (In the Senate - Filed March 12, 2015; March 23, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 29, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 1;
 April 29, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1634 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to limiting certain powers of the Goforth Special Utility
 District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 7212, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 7212.103 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 7212.103.  LIMIT ON EMINENT DOMAIN POWER. The district
 may not exercise the power of eminent domain to condemn property
 located outside the boundaries or service area of the district
 unless the district exercises that power for a project the district
 owns and operates.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *