Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1641 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/13/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 1641


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to developing and maintaining risk assessment criteria for
 use in determining whether an elderly or disabled person is in
 imminent risk of abuse.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 48, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 48.2055 to read as follows:
 Sec. 48.2055.  PILOT PROGRAM. (a)  The department shall,
 out of funds appropriated, implement a pilot program to evaluate
 the feasibility and any associated benefits of providing protective
 services when an elderly or disabled person has been determined to
 be at risk of future harm from abuse, neglect, or exploitation using
 the risk assessment criteria described in Section 48.004(a).
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 48.002(a)(5), the provision of
 protective services in an area in which a pilot program described by
 subsection (a) has been implemented does not require that an
 elderly or disabled person be in a state of abuse, neglect, or
 exploitation.
 (c)  Notwithstanding Section 48.1523, the department is not
 required to conduct a management review of recidivistic cases in an
 area in which a pilot program described by subsection (a) has been
 implemented.
 SECTION 2.  The department shall implement the pilot program
 described in section 48.2055, Human Resources Code, not later than
 January 1, 2016. The pilot may be conducted up until August 31, 2017
 but may terminate earlier if, in the discretion of the adult
 protective services program, it is appropriate for the program to
 be terminated. DFPS shall submit a report of preliminary findings
 from the program to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and
 appropriate legislative committees having oversight over the Adult
 Protective Services division not later than December 15, 2016 and
 on any additional findings not later than December 15, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  Section 48.2055, Human Resources Code, expires
 August 31, 2017.
 SECTION 4.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.