Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB169 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/23/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 169


 AN ACT
 relating to ensuring that certain military members and their
 spouses and dependents maintain their positions on interest lists
 or other waiting lists for certain health and human services
 assistance programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.0931 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.0931.  INTEREST LIST OR OTHER WAITING LIST RULES
 FOR CERTAIN MILITARY MEMBERS AND THEIR DEPENDENTS.  (a)  In this
 section, "military member" means a member of the United States
 military serving in the army, navy, air force, marine corps, or
 coast guard on active duty.
 (b)  This section applies only to:
 (1)  a military member who has declared and maintains
 this state as the member's state of legal residence in the manner
 provided by the applicable military branch, or a spouse or
 dependent child of the member; or
 (2)  the spouse or dependent child of a former military
 member who had declared and maintained this state as the member's
 state of legal residence in the manner provided by the applicable
 military branch and who:
 (A)  was killed in action; or
 (B)  died while in service.
 (c)  The executive commissioner by rule shall require the
 commission or another health and human services agency to:
 (1)  maintain the position of a person subject to this
 section in the queue of an interest list or other waiting list for
 any assistance program, including a Section 1915(c) waiver program,
 provided by the commission or other health and human services
 agency, if the person cannot receive benefits under the assistance
 program because the person temporarily resides out of state as the
 result of military service; and
 (2)  subject to Subsection (e), offer benefits to the
 person according to the person's position on the interest list or
 other waiting list that was attained while the person resided out of
 state if the person returns to reside in this state.
 (d)  If a person subject to this section reaches a position
 on an interest list or other waiting list that would allow the
 person to receive benefits under an assistance program but the
 person cannot receive the benefits because the person temporarily
 resides out of state as the result of military service, the
 commission or agency providing the benefits shall maintain the
 person's position on the list relative to other persons on the list
 but continue to offer benefits to other persons on the interest list
 or other waiting list in accordance with those persons' respective
 positions on the list.
 (e)  In adopting rules under Subsection (c), the executive
 commissioner must limit the amount of time a person may maintain the
 person's position on an interest list or other waiting list under
 Subsection (c) to not more than one year after the date on which, as
 applicable:
 (1)  the member's active duty ends;
 (2)  the member was killed if the member was killed in
 action; or
 (3)  the member died if the member died while in
 service.
 SECTION 2.  The executive commissioner of the Health and
 Human Services Commission shall adopt the rules necessary to
 implement Section 531.0931, Government Code, as added by this Act,
 not later than December 1, 2015.
 SECTION 3.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver, an amendment to an existing
 waiver, or another authorization from a federal agency is necessary
 for implementation of that provision, the agency affected by the
 provision shall request the waiver, amendment to the existing
 waiver, or other authorization and may delay implementing that
 provision until the waiver, amendment, or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 169 passed the Senate on
 March 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 22, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 169 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 19, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor