Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1699 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Huffman S.B. No. 1699
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 23, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 16, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 16, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of May as Postpartum Depression
 Awareness Month.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.110 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.110.  POSTPARTUM DEPRESSION AWARENESS MONTH.
 (a)  May is Postpartum Depression Awareness Month to increase
 awareness of postpartum depression and to encourage:
 (1)  the identification of signs, symptoms, and
 treatment options for postpartum depression;
 (2)  the creation and update of lists of recommended
 materials for perinatal mental health available through the
 Department of State Health Services and the Health and Human
 Services Commission;
 (3)  electronic circulation of and posting on state and
 local agency websites of recommended postpartum depression
 resources;
 (4)  mothers-to-be and new mothers to be screened for
 postpartum depression using validated survey instruments; and
 (5)  collaboration between governmental agencies,
 educational institutions, hospitals, private health care
 practices, health insurance providers, Medicaid providers, and
 mental health agencies to increase awareness of postpartum
 affective illness.
 (b)  Postpartum Depression Awareness Month shall be
 regularly observed through appropriate programs and activities to
 increase awareness of postpartum depression.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *