Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1733 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Uresti S.B. No. 1733
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 24, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 28, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 28, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1733 By:  Ellis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the disclosure in certain judicial proceedings of
 confidential communications between a physician and a patient.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 159.002, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (f) and (g) to read as follows:
 (f)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter, a
 communication or record that is otherwise confidential and
 privileged under this section may be disclosed or released by a
 physician without the patient's authorization if the disclosure or
 release is related to a judicial proceeding in which the patient is
 a party and the disclosure is requested under a subpoena issued
 under:
 (1)  the Texas Rules of Civil Procedure;
 (2)  the Code of Criminal Procedure; or
 (3)  Chapter 121, Civil Practice and Remedies Code.
 (g)  Subsection (f) does not prevent a physician from
 claiming, or otherwise limit the authority of a physician to claim,
 the privilege of confidentiality on behalf of a patient.
 SECTION 2.  Section 159.003(a), Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  An exception to the privilege of confidentiality in a
 court or administrative proceeding exists:
 (1)  in a proceeding brought by a patient against a
 physician, including:
 (A)  a malpractice proceeding; or
 (B)  a criminal proceeding or license revocation
 proceeding in which the patient is a complaining witness and
 disclosure is relevant to a claim or defense of the physician;
 (2)  if the patient or a person authorized to act on the
 patient's behalf submits a written consent to the release of
 confidential information as provided by Section 159.005;
 (3)  in a proceeding to substantiate and collect on a
 claim for medical services provided to the patient;
 (4)  in a civil action or administrative proceeding, if
 relevant, brought by the patient or a person on the patient's
 behalf, if the patient or person is attempting to recover monetary
 damages for a physical or mental condition including the patient's
 death;
 (5)  in a disciplinary investigation or proceeding
 conducted under this subtitle, if the board protects the identity
 of any patient whose billing or medical records are examined other
 than a patient:
 (A)  for whom an exception exists under
 Subdivision (1); or
 (B)  who has submitted written consent to the
 release of the billing or medical records as provided by Section
 159.005;
 (6)  in a criminal investigation of a physician in
 which the board is participating, or assisting in the investigation
 or proceeding by providing certain billing or medical records
 obtained from the physician, if the board protects the identity of a
 patient whose billing or medical records are provided in the
 investigation or proceeding other than a patient:
 (A)  for whom an exception exists under
 Subdivision (1); or
 (B)  who has submitted written consent to the
 release of the billing or medical records as provided by Section
 159.005;
 (7)  in an involuntary civil commitment proceeding,
 proceeding for court-ordered treatment, or probable cause hearing
 under Chapter 462, 574, or 593, Health and Safety Code;
 (8)  if the patient's physical or mental condition is
 relevant to the execution of a will;
 (9)  if the information is relevant to a proceeding
 brought under Section 159.009;
 (10)  in a criminal prosecution in which the patient is
 a victim, witness, or defendant;
 (11)  to satisfy a request for billing or medical
 records of a deceased or incompetent person under Section
 74.051(e), Civil Practice and Remedies Code; or
 (12)  to a court or a party to an action under a court
 order [or court subpoena].
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *