Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1735 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/13/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Birdwell, et al. S.B. No. 1735


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to tuition and fee exemptions at public institutions of
 higher education for certain military personnel and their
 dependents.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 54.341, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b-1), and (l) and adding Subsections
 (a-0), (a-5), and (p) to read as follows:
 (a)  The governing board of each institution of higher
 education shall exempt the following persons from the payment of
 tuition, dues, fees, and other required charges, including fees for
 correspondence courses but excluding general deposit fees, student
 services fees, and any fees or charges for lodging, board, or
 clothing, provided the person seeking the exemption established and
 maintained a domicile in this state as described by Section
 54.052(a)(1) and satisfies the residency requirement under
 Subsection (a-0) [currently resides in this state and entered the
 service at a location in this state, declared this state as the
 person's home of record in the manner provided by the applicable
 military or other service, or would have been determined to be a
 resident of this state for purposes of Subchapter B at the time the
 person entered the service]:
 (1)  all nurses and honorably discharged members of the
 armed forces of the United States who served during the
 Spanish-American War or during World War I;
 (2)  all nurses, members of the Women's Army Auxiliary
 Corps, members of the Women's Auxiliary Volunteer Emergency
 Service, and all honorably discharged members of the armed forces
 of the United States who served during World War II except those who
 were discharged from service because they were over the age of 38 or
 because of a personal request on the part of the person that the
 person be discharged from service;
 (3)  all honorably discharged men and women of the
 armed forces of the United States who served during the national
 emergency which began on June 27, 1950, and which is referred to as
 the Korean War; and
 (4)  all persons who were honorably discharged from the
 armed forces of the United States after serving on active military
 duty, excluding training, for more than 180 days and who served a
 portion of their active duty during:
 (A)  the Cold War which began on the date of the
 termination of the national emergency cited in Subdivision (3);
 (B)  the Vietnam era which began on December 21,
 1961, and ended on May 7, 1975;
 (C)  the Grenada and Lebanon era which began on
 August 24, 1982, and ended on July 31, 1984;
 (D)  the Panama era which began on December 20,
 1989, and ended on January 21, 1990;
 (E)  the Persian Gulf War which began on August 2,
 1990, and ends on the date thereafter prescribed by Presidential
 proclamation or September 1, 1997, whichever occurs first;
 (F)  the national emergency by reason of certain
 terrorist attacks that began on September 11, 2001; or
 (G)  any future national emergency declared in
 accordance with federal law.
 (a-0)  To be eligible for an exemption provided by this
 section, a person must have resided in this state continuously for
 the eight years immediately preceding the first class date of the
 semester or term to which the exemption would apply. This
 subsection does not apply to a person who was born in this state.
 (a-5)  A person who received an exemption under this section
 for an academic year before the 2015-2016 academic year continues
 to be eligible for the exemption provided by this section as this
 section existed on January 1, 2015.
 (b-1)  To qualify for an exemption under Subsection (a-2) or
 (b), the spouse or child must have established and maintained a
 domicile in this state as described by Section 54.052(a)(1) or (2),
 as applicable, and satisfy the residency requirement under
 Subsection (a-0) [be classified as a resident under Subchapter B on
 the date of the spouse's or child's registration].
 (l)  To be eligible to receive an exemption under Subsection
 (k), the child must:
 (1)  have established and maintained a domicile in this
 state as described by Section 54.052(a)(1) or (2), as applicable,
 and satisfy the residency requirement under Subsection (a-0) [be a
 student who is classified as a resident under Subchapter B when the
 child enrolls in an institution of higher education];
 (2)  as a graduate or undergraduate student, maintain a
 grade point average that satisfies the grade point average
 requirement for making satisfactory academic progress in a degree,
 certificate, or continuing education program as determined by the
 institution at which the child is enrolled in accordance with the
 institution's policy regarding eligibility for financial aid; and
 (3)  be 25 years of age or younger on the first day of
 the semester or other academic term for which the exemption is
 claimed.
 (p)  An institution of higher education shall require a
 person receiving an exemption under this section to complete a Free
 Application for Federal Student Aid (FAFSA). The institution may
 not use the information obtained from a person's FAFSA to encourage
 or require the person to obtain a student loan, but may use the
 information to make a person aware of grant opportunities.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act to Section
 54.341, Education Code, apply beginning with tuition and fees
 charged for the 2015 fall semester. Tuition and fees charged for a
 term or semester before the 2015 fall semester are governed by the
 law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.