Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1737 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2015

                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1737
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 24, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 23, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 23, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1737 By:  Huffines


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a segment of State Highway 83 in
 Hidalgo County as the World War II Veterans 349th Regt. 88th Inf.
 Div. Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.0286 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.0286.  WORLD WAR II VETERANS 349TH REGT. 88TH INF.
 DIV. MEMORIAL HIGHWAY. (a)  The portion of State Highway 83 in
 Hidalgo County between its intersection with North Inspiration Road
 and its intersection with South Stewart Road is designated as the
 World War II Veterans 349th Regt. 88th Inf. Div. Memorial Highway.
 The designation is in addition to any other designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the World War II Veterans 349th Regt. 88th Inf. Div.
 Memorial Highway and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *