Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1750 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1750


 AN ACT
 relating to the requirements for employment positions provided
 through the Texas college work-study program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 56.076, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 56.076.  ELIGIBLE EMPLOYER.  (a)  An eligible
 institution may enter into agreements with employers that
 participate in the work-study program.  To be eligible to
 participate in the work-study program, an employer must:
 (1)  provide part-time employment to an eligible
 student in nonpartisan and nonsectarian activities;
 (2)  provide, insofar as is practicable, employment to
 an eligible student that is related to the student's academic
 interests;
 (3)  use Texas college work-study program positions
 only to supplement and not to supplant positions normally filled by
 persons not eligible to participate in the work-study program;
 (4)  provide from sources other than federal college
 work-study program funds a percentage of an employed student's
 wages that is equal to the percentage of a student's wages that the
 employer would be required to provide to the student in that
 academic year under the federal college work-study program; and
 (5)  provide from sources other than federal college
 work-study funds 100 percent of other employee benefits for the
 employed student.
 (b)  Each eligible institution shall ensure that at least 20
 percent but not more than 50 percent of the employment positions
 provided through the work-study program in an academic year are
 provided by employers eligible under this section who are providing
 employment located off campus.
 SECTION 2.  Section 56.079(l), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (l)  Notwithstanding Section 56.076(a) [56.076], a
 participating entity that employs a student mentor under the
 work-study student mentorship program shall provide from sources
 other than federal college work-study funds:
 (1)  not less than 10 percent of the employed student's
 wages; and
 (2)  100 percent of other employee benefits for the
 employed student.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter E, Chapter 56, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 56.082 to read as follows:
 Sec. 56.082.  BIENNIAL REPORT. (a)  Not later than January
 1 of each odd-numbered year, the Texas Higher Education
 Coordinating Board shall submit to the standing legislative
 committees with primary jurisdiction over higher education and post
 on the coordinating board's Internet website a report on the Texas
 college work-study program.  The report must include the total
 number of students employed through the program, disaggregated by:
 (1)  the employment position's location on or off
 campus; and
 (2)  the employer's status as a for-profit or nonprofit
 entity.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board shall submit its initial report under
 that subsection not later than May 1, 2019.  This subsection expires
 September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act to Sections
 56.076 and 56.079, Education Code, apply to participation in the
 Texas college work-study program beginning with the 2016-2017
 academic year.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1750 passed the Senate on
 April 16, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays 2;
 May 25, 2015, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 27, 2015, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2015, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 29,
 Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1750 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 123,
 Nays 15, two present not voting; May 27, 2015, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 30, 2015, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 139, Nays 4, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor