By: Campbell S.B. No. 1753 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 24, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services; April 9, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 9, 2015, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1753 By: Estes A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the identification requirements of certain health care providers associated with a hospital. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 241.009, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows: (c) For purposes of Subsection (b)(3), the identification badge of a health care provider licensed under Title 3, Occupations Code, must clearly state: (1) "physician," if the provider holds a license under Subtitle B of that title; (2) "chiropractor," "podiatrist," "midwife," "physician assistant," "acupuncturist," or "surgical assistant," as applicable, if the provider holds a license under Subtitle C of that title; (3) "dentist" or "dental hygienist," as applicable, if the provider holds a license under Subtitle D of that title; (4) "licensed vocational nurse," "registered nurse," "nurse practitioner," "nurse midwife," "nurse anesthetist," or "clinical nurse specialist," as applicable, if the provider holds a license under Subtitle E of that title; (5) "optometrist," or "therapeutic optometrist," as applicable, if the provider holds a license under Subtitle F of that title; (6) "speech-language pathologist" or "audiologist," as applicable, if the provider holds a license under Subtitle G of that title; (7) "physical therapist," "occupational therapist," or "massage therapist," as applicable, if the provider holds a license under Subtitle H of that title; (8) "medical radiologic technologist," "medical physicist," "perfusionist," "respiratory care practitioner," "orthotist," or "prosthetist," as applicable, if the provider holds a license or certificate, as appropriate, under Subtitle K of that title; and (9) "dietitian," if the provider holds a license under Subtitle M of that title. (d) Notwithstanding Subsection (b)(3), a hospital licensed under this chapter is not required to list the type of license held by a provider on a health care provider's photo identification badge until September 1, 2017. This subsection expires September 1, 2018. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. * * * * *