Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1753 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/09/2015

                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 1753
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 24, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 9, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 9, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1753 By:  Estes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the identification requirements of certain health care
 providers associated with a hospital.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 241.009, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows:
 (c)  For purposes of Subsection (b)(3), the identification
 badge of a health care provider licensed under Title 3, Occupations
 Code, must clearly state:
 (1)  "physician," if the provider holds a license under
 Subtitle B of that title;
 (2)  "chiropractor," "podiatrist," "midwife,"
 "physician assistant," "acupuncturist," or "surgical assistant,"
 as applicable, if the provider holds a license under Subtitle C of
 that title;
 (3)  "dentist" or "dental hygienist," as applicable, if
 the provider holds a license under Subtitle D of that title;
 (4)  "licensed vocational nurse," "registered nurse,"
 "nurse practitioner," "nurse midwife," "nurse anesthetist," or
 "clinical nurse specialist," as applicable, if the provider holds a
 license under Subtitle E of that title;
 (5)  "optometrist," or "therapeutic optometrist," as
 applicable, if the provider holds a license under Subtitle F of that
 title;
 (6)  "speech-language pathologist" or "audiologist,"
 as applicable, if the provider holds a license under Subtitle G of
 that title;
 (7)  "physical therapist," "occupational therapist,"
 or "massage therapist," as applicable, if the provider holds a
 license under Subtitle H of that title;
 (8)  "medical radiologic technologist," "medical
 physicist," "perfusionist," "respiratory care practitioner,"
 "orthotist," or "prosthetist," as applicable, if the provider holds
 a license or certificate, as appropriate, under Subtitle K of that
 title; and
 (9)  "dietitian," if the provider holds a license under
 Subtitle M of that title.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b)(3), a hospital licensed
 under this chapter is not required to list the type of license held
 by a provider on a health care provider's photo identification
 badge until September 1, 2017.  This subsection expires September
 1, 2018.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *